Have you ever wondered about the mysterious, ancient system of mathematics called Vedic Maths? This system of mathematics is said to be over 5,000 years old and has been handed down from generation to generation.

Vedic Maths is known for its simplicity, accuracy, and speed. Vedic maths tricks are said to be able to solve complex problems easily and efficiently.

Vedic maths tricks are renowned for their intriguing methods of solving mathematics problems. It has been used for centuries in India, and its unique approach to mathematics problem-solving has made it a popular choice for students and teachers alike. In this blog, we will delve into the history and theories of Vedic Maths, and explore 10 vedic maths tricks for faster calculation.

## What is Vedic Maths?

The ancient Indian system of Vedic Mathematics has been around since the Vedic period and is quickly gaining attention and popularity in the modern era. Math facts are majorly based on vedic maths. Vedic maths tricks are known for their simplification of complex calculations, speed, and accuracy. Learning the tricks from vedic maths is how to score good marks in maths.

Explore the fascinating world of Vedic Mathematics and discover its potential!

## Father of Vedic Maths

Math is one of the most important subjects in the world, and its history stretches back to ancient times. Vedic Maths is one of the oldest branches of mathematics, with a vast body of knowledge that continues to fascinate mathematicians and students alike. But who is the father of Vedic Maths?

The father of Vedic Maths is a highly debated topic, with many theories and explanations posited by mathematicians and scholars around the world. While many believe that the ancient Indian sage Bharata Muni was the founder of Vedic Maths, other theories point to the ancient Vedic culture as the source of this unique form of mathematics. No matter who is credited with the development of Vedic Maths, one thing is certain – this ancient form of mathematics continues to fascinate and intrigue mathematicians, scholars, and enthusiasts alike.

## Benefits of Vedic Maths Tricks

Vedic maths is an ancient and powerful system of mathematics. Learn vedic maths and solve complex mathematical problems in a fraction of the time it would take to solve them using conventional methods.

In the modern world, vedic mathematics for beginners has become increasingly popular due to its many benefits. From professionals to students, everyone is reaping the benefits of this powerful maths system. Here are 7 benefits of Vedic maths that you should know about.

**1. Faster Calculations:** With Vedic maths tricks, calculations can be done much faster than with traditional maths. This is because Vedic maths involves using special algorithms and techniques that allow for quick calculations. This makes it ideal for professionals and students who need to solve complex calculations quickly.

**2. Improved Concentration: **Vedic maths tricks involves the use of mental math techniques that can help improve concentration and focus. This is because the techniques used require the practitioner to concentrate more on the problem at hand. This can help to improve concentration and focus, especially when dealing with complex calculations.

**3. Improved Memory:** Vedic maths tricks involves the use of memory techniques that can help to improve memory. This is because the techniques require the practitioner to remember and recall information quickly. This can help to improve memory, especially when dealing with complex calculations.

**4. Improved Problem-Solving Skills:** Vedic maths tricks involves the use of problem-solving techniques that can help to improve problem-solving skills. This is because the techniques used require the practitioner to think logically and creatively in order to solve the problem. This can help to improve problem-solving skills, especially when dealing with complex calculations.

**5. Improved Mental Agility:** Vedic maths tricks also involves the use of mental agility techniques that can help to improve mental agility. This is because the techniques used require the practitioner to think quickly and make timely decisions. This can help to improve mental agility, especially when dealing with complex calculations.

**6. Improved Flexibility:** Vedic maths tricks involves the use of flexibility techniques that can help to improve flexibility. This is because the techniques used require the practitioner to be flexible and adaptable in order to solve the problem. This can help to improve flexibility, especially when dealing with complex calculations.

**7. Improved Mathematical Skills:** Vedic maths tricks also involves the use of mathematical skills that can help to improve mathematical skills. This is because the techniques used require the practitioner to think deeply and analyze the problem in order to solve it. This can help to improve mathematical skills, especially when dealing with complex calculations. Using your maths notes to regularly revise the vedic maths tricks can help you to apply them in exams.

Overall, Vedic maths tricks offer a number of benefits that can help to improve a person’s mathematical skills. From improving concentration and memory to improving problem-solving skills and mental agility, vedic maths formulas can be a great tool for anyone looking to improve their mathematical skills.

## 10 Vedic Maths Tricks

**1. Squaring Of A Number Whose Unit Digit Is 5**

One of the vedic maths tricks that answer how to calculate fast is squaring of a number whose unit digit is 5. You can quickly compute the square of a two-digit number that ends with 5. Irrespective of the syllabus you are studying (be it CBSE or ICSE), you will certainly come across such sums. For instance, to calculate (55)² =?

Step 1. Multiply 55 x 55 = . . 25 (end terms)

Step 2. Take 5x (5+1) = 30

So the answer is 3025.

Now that you have understood the process, try to find the square of 75 & 95.

**2. Multiply a Number By 5**

One of the popular vedic maths tricks is multiplying a number by 5. Multiplying any number by 5 can be done with a simple trick that reduces the time it takes to do the calculation. To multiply an even number by 5, simply divide the number by 2 and then add a 0 to the end of the result. For example, 2464 x 5 = 24640 (2464/2 = 1232, 1232 + 0 = 12320). To multiply an odd number by 5, subtract 1 from the number, divide it by 2, and add a 5 to the end of the result. For example, 3775 x 5 = 18875 (3775 – 1 = 1874, 1874/2 = 1887, 1887 + 5 = 18875). To test your knowledge, try 1234 x 5 = 6170 and 123 x 5 = 615.

**3. Subtraction From 1000, 10000, 100000**

While subtractions from 1000s seem difficult, vedic mathematics tricks make it easier. To subtract a number from 100’s multiple such as 1000, 10000, etc. quickly, one could employ the Vedic Math Tricks. For example, to subtract 1000 – 573, one could subtract each figure in 573 from 9 and then subtract the last figure from 10. Step 1. 9 – 5 = 4, Step 2. 9 – 7 = 2, Step 3. 10 – 3 = 7. Thus, the answer is: (1000 – 573) = 427. Here are some practice sums for you to try using this technique: 1000 – 857, 10,000 – 1029, 10,000 – 1264, and 1000 – 336.

**4. Multiplication Of Any 2-digit Numbers (11 – 19)**

One of the beneficial vedic maths tricks for multiplication is to multiply any two-digit number from 11 to 19 quickly and accurately, employing this Vedic Trick. After a few times of practicing, you will be able to calculate faster than a calculator.

Follow these 4 steps:

Step 1: Add the unit digit of the smaller number to the larger number.

Step 2: Multiply the result by 10.

Step 3: Multiply the unit digits of the numbers.

Step 4: Add the two numbers.

For instance, when multiplying 13 and 15, the answer is 195:

Step 1: 15 + 3 = 18.

Step 2: 18 * 10 = 180.

Step 3: 3 * 5 = 15.

Step 4: Add 180 + 15 = 195.

**5. Dividing A Large Number By 5**

One of the effective vedic maths tricks is to divide a large number by 5.

To find the answer for 16951/5:

Step 1: 16951 * 2 = 33902

Step 2: Move the decimal: 3390.2 or just 3390

To find the answer for 2112/5:

Step 1: 2112 * 2 = 4224

Step 2: Move the decimal: 422.4 or just 422

To find the answer for 4731/5:

Step 1: 4731 * 2 = 9462

Step 2: Move the decimal: 946.2 or just 946

**6. Multiply Any Two-digit Number By 11**

One of the vedic maths tricks for fast calculation is to finish a multiplication problem in only 2 seconds. Examples such as 32 x 11 = 352, 52 x 11 = 572, and 35 x 11 = 385 demonstrate how this method works. Why not give it a go with 19*11 and 18*11 to see if you can get the same results?

**7. Multiplication Of Any 3-digit Numbers**

For 808 and 806, subtract the last 2 digits from the actual number:

808-8=800

806-6=800

Select any number and add the last 2 digits of the other number:

808 + 6 = 814

Multiply the product of Step 2 and Step 1: 814 x 800 = 651200

The last 2 digits of both numbers are 8 & 6. The product of these two numbers: 8 x 6 = 48

Last step: 651200 + 48 = 651248

Therefore, 808 x 806 = 651248

For 536 and 504, subtract the last 2 digits from the actual number:

536-36=500

504-4=500

Select any number and add the last 2 digits of the other number:

536 + 4 = 540

Multiply the product of Step 2 and Step 1: 540 x 500 = 270000

The last 2 digits of both numbers are 36 & 4. The product of these two numbers: 36 x 4 = 144

Last step: 270000 + 144 = 270144

Therefore, 536 x 504 = 270144

Note – This Rule is applicable when the Hundredths Place digit is the same in both numbers such as **2**09 and **2**23 Or say **4**08 and **4**50 Or **6**20 and **6**64.

**8. Find The Square Value**

Calculating the square of a number using the Vedic Maths Trick is straightforward. To do so, take the following steps:

Step 1. Select a base close to the original number.

Step 2. Calculate the difference between the original number and the base.

Step 3. Add the original number and the difference.

Step 4. Multiply the result of Step 3 by the base.

Step 5. Add the square of the difference with the result of Step 4. For example, to find the square of 99:

Step 1. Choose 100 as the base.

Step 2. Difference: 99 – 100 = -1

Step 3. Add the number with the difference = 99 + (-1) = 98

Step 4. Multiply the result with the base = 98 * 100 = 9800

Step 5. Add the product of the square of the difference = 9800 + (-1)² = 9801

Therefore, (99)² = 9801.

You can also try it for (98)², (97)², (102)², (101)² to practice.

**9. Multiply any large number by 12**

Simply multiply the last digit of any number by 12 before doubling each digit after that and adding them together.

For instance, 13243 * 12 =

Let’s decompose it into manageable steps:

Step 1: Multiply 13243 by 12 to get ___ (Double of last digit 3).

Step 2: Take 13243 x 12 to get 16 (now multiply 4 by 8 to get 8 Plus 3 to obtain 11; 1 will carry over).

Step 3: 13243 x 12 = ___916 (Now multiply 2 by 4 to get 4 + 4 + 1 to get 9)

Step 4. 13243* 12= 8916 (Now multiply 3 by 2 to get 6, and add 6 to 2 to get 8)

Step 5. 13243 * 12= 58916 (Now multiply 1 by 2 and multiply it by 3 to get 5)

Step 6. 13243 * 12= 158916 (Now multiply 0 by 2 and add 1 to get 0+1=2)

10. Convert Kg to Pounds

**10. Conversion of Kilograms to Pounds**

Here’s an illustration: 112 kg to pounds conversion.

Step 1: Double the kilogram value by two (112X2)= 224

2. Divide the preceding number by 10

(224/10 = 22.4).

3. Add the two numbers together: 224 + 22.4 Equals 246.4 pounds.

We hope that these Vedic math tips can help you swiftly answer arithmetic issues. But when it comes to Vedic mathematics, there are always more tricks to learn.

thanks for sharing these vedic maths tricks

Hi, my name is Nora, I am 10, and I’ve had trouble with math for ages, it never seemed to make sense, but yesterday my grandfather showed me Vedic math, and it’s really easy! Then I found Oswal, you explain things really well, and I FINALLY found a way to make things easy.

VEDIC MATHS IS IRREPLACABLE. ITS TRICKS ARE SO EFFICIENT AND FAST THAT IT SHOULD BE INCLUDED IN SCHOOLS AS EXTRA-CURRICULUM SUBJECT. THANKS FOR SHARING ALL THESE TRICKS. AS A STUDENT, THESE TRICKS ARE VERY HELPFUL. I HOPE VEDIC MATHS BECOME MORE POPULAR IN THE NEXT GENERATIONS. LOOKING FORWARD TO IT. THANK YOU ONCE AGAIN.

Sir, it’s very nice and thank you to show the easy tricks , but one small request sir, multiplication by 12 is little bit tough, can we have another example. Thank you sir

This very nice and helpful post for the students. This helps students to learn tricks for faster calculations. I am really impressed with such type of post. Thanks for sharing such nice post.